AK HR7 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - HOUSE RESOLVE 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Brain Injury Awareness Month

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brain Injury Awareness Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24HouseHOUSE RESOLVE 1
2021-05-24House12:40 P.M. 5/24/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2021-03-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2021-03-24HousePASSED Y39 E1
2021-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(H.RLS)(SUBMITTED BY RULES)
2021-03-24HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-03-24HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2021
2021-03-17HouseHSS REFERRAL REMOVED
2021-03-03HouseHSS
2021-03-03HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback