AK HR7 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the importance of safe school environments for students, staff, and their families; and supporting improvement of school safety measures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting A Safe School Environment

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-01HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-01HouseVERSION: HR 7 AM
2018-05-01HousePASSED Y37 N1 E2
2018-05-01HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y14 N23 E3
2018-05-01HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2018-05-01HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-01HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2018
2018-04-30HouseFN1: ZERO(H.EDC)
2018-04-30HouseNR: TALERICO
2018-04-30HouseDP: PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, DRUMMOND
2018-04-30HouseEDC RPT 3DP 1NR
2018-04-26HouseEDC
2018-04-26HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback