AK HR7 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-03 - KAWASAKI REPLACED DOOGAN
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-03 - KAWASAKI REPLACED DOOGAN
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a House Special Committee on Fiscal Policy.
Title
House Special Committee On Fiscal Policy
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | KAWASAKI REPLACED DOOGAN | |
2011-05-10 | PERMANENTLY FILED 5/9 HOUSE RESOLVE 7 | |
2011-04-05 | 9:38 AM 4/5/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2011-04-01 | JOHNSON (ALT) | |
2011-04-01 | FAIRCLOUGH (CHAIR), AUSTERMAN, HERRON, PRUITT, T.WILSON, DOOGAN, TUCK, | |
2011-04-01 | PASSED Y38 E2 | |
2011-04-01 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-01 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | RLS | |
2011-03-29 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |