AK HR6 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - HOUSE RESOLVE NO. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Department of the Interior to maintain three lease sales in the Chukchi Sea and Beaufort Sea Planning Areas and two lease sales in the Cook Inlet Planning Area and to remove certain potential lease sales.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ocs Oil & Gas Leasing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-23HouseHOUSE RESOLVE NO. 6
2018-02-23House4:41 PM 2/21/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-02-21HouseGUTTENBERG, CLAMAN, LEDOUX, MILLETT
2018-02-21HouseCHENAULT, GARA, GRENN, DRUMMOND, JOHNSON, TALERICO, LINCOLN, SADDLER, KAWASAKI,
2018-02-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO, TUCK, STUTES, ORTIZ, SEATON, BIRCH, JOHNSTON,
2018-02-21HousePASSED Y33 N5 E1 V1
2018-02-21HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y30 N8 E1 V1
2018-02-21HouseBILL REPRINTED 2/21/18
2018-02-21HousePRIME COSPONSOR CHANGE: EDGMON
2018-02-21HouseFN1: ZERO(H.RLS)(SUBMITTED BY RULES)
2018-02-21HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-19HouseHELD TO 2/21 CALENDAR
2018-02-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/2018
2018-02-16HouseRLS
2018-02-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback