AK HR5 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/27 HOUSE RESOLVE 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

House Special Cmte: Tribal Affairs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Special Cmte: Tribal Affairs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HousePERMANENTLY FILED 4/27 HOUSE RESOLVE 5
2021-03-05House12:15 PM 3/5/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2021-03-01HouseMEMBERS: DRUMMOND REMOVED
2021-02-24HouseMEMBERS: TARR ADDED
2021-02-19HouseMEMBERS: ORTIZ, FIELDS, DRUMMOND, CRONK
2021-02-18HouseMEMBERS: ZULKOSKY (CHAIR)
2021-02-18HouseVERSION: HR 5
2021-02-18HousePASSED Y36 N3 A1
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-02-18HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/18/2021
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback