AK HR3 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/27 HOUSE RESOLVE 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/27 HOUSE RESOLVE 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Special Committee On Fisheries
Title
House Special Committee On Fisheries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 4/27 HOUSE RESOLVE 3 |
2021-03-05 | House | 12:15 P.M. 3/5/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-03 | House | MEMBERS: TARR REPLACED STUTES AS CHAIR, STUTES CHANGED TO MEMBER |
2021-02-19 | House | MEMBERS: TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS, STORY, ORTIZ, VANCE, MCCABE |
2021-02-18 | House | MEMBERS: STUTES (CHAIR) |
2021-02-18 | House | VERSION: HR 3 |
2021-02-18 | House | PASSED Y39 A1 |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-02-18 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/18/2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |