AK HR17 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 HOUSE RESOLVE 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Department of Energy to expeditiously approve a two-year extension of the export license for the Kenai liquefied natural gas plant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Export License Ext. For Kenai Lng Plant

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-27 PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 HOUSE RESOLVE 12
2010-07-09 3:00 PM 5/20/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2010-04-15 PASSED Y40
2010-04-15 AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-15 AM NO 2 FAILED Y11 N29
2010-04-15 AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-15 RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-15 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-15 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2010
2010-04-14 DP: MILLETT, KERTTULA, OLSON, GARDNER, NEUMAN, DAHLSTROM
2010-04-14 RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 6DP
2010-04-10 RLS
2010-04-10 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback