AK HR14 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to oppose federal health care reform bills.
Title
Oppose Federal Health Care Reform Bills
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Chenault [R] | Rep. Nancy Dahlstrom [R] | Rep. Wes Keller [R] | Rep. Michael Kelly [R] |
Rep. Kurt Olson [R] | Rep. Jay Ramras [R] | Sen. Bill Stoltze [R] | Rep. Peggy Wilson [R] |
Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS | |
2010-03-19 | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE | |
2010-03-19 | HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-19 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-19 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | FN1: ZERO(H.HSS) | |
2010-03-17 | NR: SEATON, HERRON | |
2010-03-17 | DNP: HOLMES, CISSNA | |
2010-03-17 | DP: T.WILSON, LYNN, KELLER | |
2010-03-17 | HSS RPT CS(HSS) 3DP 2DNP 2NR | |
2010-03-12 | COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON | |
2010-03-10 | COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE | |
2010-02-17 | HSS | |
2010-02-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |