AK HR13 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 HOUSE RESOLVE 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 HOUSE RESOLVE 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ak Salmon Research Task Force Act
Title
Ak Salmon Research Task Force Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 HOUSE RESOLVE 13 |
2022-10-05 | House | 2:10 P.M. 7/7/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-23 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-18 | House | VERSION: HR 13 |
2022-05-18 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2022-05-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-18 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2022 |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-17 | House | MOTION TO PLACE ON 5/18 CALENDAR UC |
2022-05-17 | House | DISCHARGE FROM FSH UC |
2022-05-17 | House | FSH |
2022-05-17 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |