AK HR11 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rename Saginaw Bay As Skanax Bay

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rename Saginaw Bay As Skanax Bay

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HousePERMANENTLY FILED 6/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 10
2019-06-03House11:15 AM 5/31/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, STORY
2019-05-14HousePASSED Y36 A4
2019-05-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019
2019-05-13HouseFN1: ZERO(H.STA)
2019-05-13HouseNR: VANCE, HOPKINS, WOOL
2019-05-13HouseDP: STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS
2019-05-13HouseSTA RPT 2DP 3NR
2019-05-08HouseSTA
2019-05-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback