AK HR10 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reauthorize Violence Against Women Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reauthorize Violence Against Women Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17HousePERMANENTLY FILED 6/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 9
2019-06-03HouseHOUSE RESOLVE NO. 9
2019-06-03House11:15 AM 5/31/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-30HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2019-05-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TUCK, JOHNSTON, HANNAN, CLAMAN, WILSON, STORY
2019-05-14HousePASSED Y34 N3 A3
2019-05-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2019-05-13HouseHELD TO 5/14 CALENDAR
2019-05-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2019
2019-05-03HouseFN1: ZERO(H.TRB)
2019-05-03HouseDP: VANCE, LINCOLN, TALERICO, ORTIZ, ZULKOSKY
2019-05-03HouseTRB RPT 5DP
2019-05-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS, VANCE
2019-05-01HouseTRB
2019-05-01HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback