AK HJR9 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States government to continue to work with the government of Canada to investigate the long-term, region-wide downstream effects of proposed and existing industrial development and to develop measures to ensure that state resources are not harmed by upstream development in British Columbia; and urging the United States government to continue to work with the government of Canada to support the complementary efforts of the state and British Columbia to collaborate on proposed and existing industrial upstream development in British Columbia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Canadian Mines On Transboundary Rivers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-16HouseWITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
2018-01-16HouseFN2: ZERO(LEG)(UPDATED FROM RULES)
2018-01-16HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 9(FSH) AM
2017-05-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2017-05-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2017-05-17HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 1/16/18 CALENDAR
2017-05-17House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2017-05-17HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2017-05-17HouseFSH CS ADOPTED UC
2017-05-17HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-16HouseHELD TO 5/17 CALENDAR
2017-05-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2017-05-15HouseNOT TAKEN UP 5/15 - ON 5/16 CALENDAR
2017-05-15HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2017
2017-05-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STUTES
2017-04-14HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-04-14HouseNR: BIRCH, JOHNSON
2017-04-14HouseDP: PARISH, DRUMMOND, JOSEPHSON, TARR
2017-04-14HouseRES RPT CS(FSH) 4DP 2NR
2017-04-07HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-04-07HouseAM: EASTMAN, NEUMAN
2017-04-07HouseNR: CHENAULT, FANSLER
2017-04-07HouseDP: KREISS-TOMKINS, TARR, STUTES
2017-04-07HouseFSH RPT CS(FSH) 3DP 2NR 2AM
2017-02-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH
2017-01-30HouseFSH, RES
2017-01-30HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback