AK HJR8 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Food and Drug Administration to deny an application to sell genetically engineered salmon in the United States; urging compliance with the provision of P.L. 110-85 (Food and Drug Administration Amendments Act of 2007) that requires the Commissioner of Food and Drugs to consult with the National Marine Fisheries Service of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration regarding a report on environmental risks associated with genetically engineered seafood products; and urging that product labeling requirements include the words "Genetically Modified" prominently displayed on the front of the package if the application is approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oppose Genetically Engineered Salmon

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-18 REFERRED TO RULES
2011-03-18 FN1: ZERO(LEG)
2011-03-18 DP: GARDNER, P.WILSON, HERRON, KAWASAKI, FEIGE, SEATON
2011-03-18 RES RPT CS(RES) NT 6DP
2011-03-09 COSPONSOR(S): HERRON
2011-02-28 COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
2011-02-14 FN1: ZERO(LEG)
2011-02-14 DP: HERRON, MILLER, PRUITT, JOHNSON, KAWASAKI, THOMPSON
2011-02-14 FSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 6DP
2011-02-11 COSPONSOR(S): GARA, SEATON
2011-01-21 COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, THOMPSON
2011-01-18 FSH, RES
2011-01-18 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback