AK HJR8 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the Constitution of the State of Alaska limiting appropriations from certain mineral revenue, relating to the balanced budget account, and relating to an appropriation limit.
Title
Const. Am: Approp. Limit/mineral Revenue
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Fairclough MacKinnon [R] | Rep. Michael Hawker [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Wes Keller [R] |
Rep. Michael Kelly [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Rep. Mark Neuman [R] | Rep. Jay Ramras [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS | |
2010-04-13 | STA, FIN | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-12 | VERSION: CSHJR 8(FIN) | |
2010-04-12 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-12 | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-11 | COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN | |
2010-04-11 | KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2010-04-11 | PASSED Y34 N6 | |
2010-04-11 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 8(FIN) | |
2010-04-10 | COSPONSOR(S): KELLER | |
2010-04-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR | |
2010-04-10 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-10 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-10 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2010 | |
2010-03-22 | FN2: (GOV) | |
2010-03-22 | NR: GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, N.FOSTER, STOLTZE | |
2010-03-22 | DP: KELLY, AUSTERMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, HAWKER | |
2010-03-22 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 5NR | |
2010-03-19 | COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, FAIRCLOUGH | |
2010-02-10 | COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS | |
2010-02-10 | FN2: (GOV) | |
2010-02-10 | NR: GRUENBERG, DAHLSTROM, HOLMES | |
2010-02-10 | DP: LYNN, RAMRAS | |
2010-02-10 | JUD RPT 2DP 3NR | |
2009-04-07 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON | |
2009-04-07 | FN1: (GOV) | |
2009-04-07 | AM: P.WILSON | |
2009-04-07 | NR: GATTO | |
2009-04-07 | DNP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, PETERSEN | |
2009-04-07 | DP: JOHNSON, LYNN | |
2009-04-07 | STA RPT 2DP 3DNP 1NR 1AM | |
2009-04-03 | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2009-04-02 | COSPONSOR REMOVED: CRAWFORD | |
2009-03-18 | COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD | |
2009-01-26 | STA, JUD, FIN | |
2009-01-26 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |