AK HJR7 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Const. Am: Perm Fund & Pfds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Const. Am: Perm Fund & Pfds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-31 - House - House: Discharge Bill from Judiciary Committee (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-04SenateFOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2021-10-04HouseFOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2021-08-31HouseDISCHARGE FROM JUD FAILED Y18 N22
2021-08-16SenateTHIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2021-08-16HouseTHIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2021-05-14SenateFIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2021-05-14HouseFIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2021-05-10HouseREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2021-05-10HouseFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2021-05-10HouseAM: KAUFMAN
2021-05-10HouseNR: STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS
2021-05-10HouseDNP: CLAMAN, EASTMAN, VANCE, TARR
2021-05-10HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) 4DNP 2NR 1AM
2021-02-18HouseGOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
2021-02-18HouseFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2021-02-18HouseSTA, JUD, FIN
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback