AK HJR7 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Alaska relating to an appropriation limit.
Title
Const. Am.: Appropriation Limit
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy Tilton [R] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Sen. Chris Birch [R] | Rep. David Talerico [R] |
Rep. Dan Saddler [R] | Rep. Colleen Sullivan-Leonard [R] | Rep. Jennifer Johnston [R] | Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WILSON |
2017-03-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSTON |
2017-02-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): BIRCH, TALERICO, SADDLER, SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2017-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2017-01-25 | House | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2017-01-25 | House | STA, JUD, FIN |
2017-01-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HJR7 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HJR007A.PDF |