AK HJR6 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - PERMANENTLY FILED 2/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing the Alaska State Legislature's support and appreciation for legislation introduced by the state's congressional delegation that would allow for the construction of a single-lane gravel road through the Izembek National Wildlife Refuge, connecting the community of King Cove with the Cold Bay Airport; and urging the United States Congress to pass the legislation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Support Road: King Cove & Cold Bay

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22HousePERMANENTLY FILED 2/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 1
2017-02-17House10:00 AM 2/16/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-02-13SenateVERSION: CSHJR 6(RES) AM
2017-02-13SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2017-02-13SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2017-02-13SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, DUNLEAVY, STEDMAN, COGHILL
2017-02-13SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 6(RES) AM
2017-02-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-02-13SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-02-13SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/13/2017
2017-02-08SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-02-08SenateDP: GIESSEL, WIELECHOWSKI, HUGHES, COGHILL, VON IMHOF, STEDMAN, MEYER
2017-02-08SenateRES RPT 7DP
2017-02-03SenateSTEVENS, MACKINNON, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, COSTELLO, BISHOP, KELLY, WILSON
2017-02-03SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, OLSON, MEYER, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN, BEGICH, HUGHES,
2017-02-03SenateRES
2017-02-03SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-02-01HouseVERSION: CSHJR 6(RES) AM
2017-02-01HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-02-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, LEDOUX, GRENN
2017-02-01HousePASSED Y39 A1
2017-02-01HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 6(RES) AM
2017-02-01HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-02-01HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2017-02-01HouseRES CS ADOPTED UC
2017-02-01HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-02-01HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/1/2017
2017-01-30HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
2017-01-30HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-01-30HouseNR: JOSEPHSON
2017-01-30HouseDP: BIRCH, TALERICO, WESTLAKE, JOHNSON, DRUMMOND, RAUSCHER, PARISH, TARR
2017-01-30HouseRES RPT CS(RES) 8DP 1NR
2017-01-25HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
2017-01-18HouseRES
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback