AK HJR53 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to pass H.R. 1034, designating the Honor and Remember Flag as an official symbol to recognize and honor members of the armed forces of the United States who died in the line of duty.
Title
Honor And Remember Flag
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | PERMANENTLY FILED 6/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 38 | |
2010-07-09 | 3:19 PM 6/10/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-07 | VERSION: HJR 53 | |
2010-04-07 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-07 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-07 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 53 | |
2010-04-07 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-07 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-07 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) | |
2010-04-06 | NR: FRENCH, PASKVAN, KOOKESH | |
2010-04-06 | DP: MENARD, MEYER | |
2010-04-06 | STA RPT 2DP 3NR | |
2010-03-30 | STA | |
2010-03-30 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-29 | VERSION: HJR 53 | |
2010-03-29 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-29 | PASSED Y40 | |
2010-03-29 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 53 | |
2010-03-29 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-29 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-29 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) | |
2010-03-24 | NR: KAWASAKI | |
2010-03-24 | DP: LYNN, BUCH, RAMRAS, HARRIS | |
2010-03-24 | MLV RPT 4DP 1NR | |
2010-03-10 | MLV | |
2010-03-10 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |