AK HJR5 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-01 - PERMANENTLY FILED 10/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress to pass legislation to open the coastal plain of the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge to oil and gas development; relating to oil and gas exploration, development, production, and royalties; and relating to renewable and alternative energy technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Endorsing Anwr Leasing; Related Issues

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-24 - House - House: Concur (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-01HousePERMANENTLY FILED 10/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
2017-03-08House1:56 PM 3/6/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-02-24HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 N4 E3 A1
2017-02-24HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2017-02-24HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2017-02-22SenateVERSION: SCS CSHJR 5(ARC)
2017-02-22SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2017-02-22SenatePASSED Y18 N2
2017-02-22SenateWILSON, KELLY
2017-02-22SenateBISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE, HUGHES, EGAN, OLSON, COGHILL, MEYER,
2017-02-22SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, DUNLEAVY, STEDMAN, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, HOFFMAN,
2017-02-22SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 5(ARC)
2017-02-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-02-22SenateARC SCS ADOPTED UC
2017-02-22SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-02-22SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/22/2017
2017-02-20SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-02-20SenateDP: GIESSEL, DUNLEAVY, KELLY, OLSON
2017-02-20SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 3
2017-02-20SenateARC RPT SCS 4DP NEW TITLE
2017-02-17SenateARC
2017-02-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-02-15HouseVERSION: CSHJR 5(AET)
2017-02-15HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-02-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TILTON, JOSEPHSON
2017-02-15HousePASSED Y31 N4 E5
2017-02-15HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
2017-02-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON
2017-02-13HouseHELD IN THIRD READING TO 2/15 CALENDAR
2017-02-13HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 5(AET)
2017-02-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, BIRCH, MILLETT, CHENAULT, PRUITT
2017-02-10HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/13 CALENDAR
2017-02-10HouseAET CS ADOPTED UC
2017-02-10HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-02-10HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2017
2017-02-10HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-02-10HouseAM: PARISH
2017-02-10HouseNR: TARR
2017-02-10HouseDP: BIRCH, TALERICO, DRUMMOND, JOHNSON, RAUSCHER, JOSEPHSON
2017-02-10HouseRES RPT CS(AET) 6DP 1NR 1AM
2017-01-30HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, SADDLER
2017-01-27HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-01-27HouseDP: TUCK, JOSEPHSON, TALERICO, WESTLAKE
2017-01-27HouseAET RPT CS(AET) 4DP
2017-01-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP, TALERICO
2017-01-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
2017-01-20HouseBILL REPRINTED 1/20/17
2017-01-20HouseAET REFERRAL ADDED BEFORE RES
2017-01-18HouseRES
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback