AK HJR5 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-01 - PERMANENTLY FILED 10/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-01 - PERMANENTLY FILED 10/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to pass legislation to open the coastal plain of the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge to oil and gas development; relating to oil and gas exploration, development, production, and royalties; and relating to renewable and alternative energy technologies.
Title
Endorsing Anwr Leasing; Related Issues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: Concur (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-01 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 10/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 2 |
2017-03-08 | House | 1:56 PM 3/6/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-02-24 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 N4 E3 A1 |
2017-02-24 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2017-02-24 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2017-02-22 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHJR 5(ARC) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2017-02-22 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N2 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | WILSON, KELLY |
2017-02-22 | Senate | BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE, HUGHES, EGAN, OLSON, COGHILL, MEYER, |
2017-02-22 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, DUNLEAVY, STEDMAN, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, HOFFMAN, |
2017-02-22 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 5(ARC) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-02-22 | Senate | ARC SCS ADOPTED UC |
2017-02-22 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-02-22 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, DUNLEAVY, KELLY, OLSON |
2017-02-20 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 3 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | ARC RPT SCS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2017-02-17 | Senate | ARC |
2017-02-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-02-15 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 5(AET) |
2017-02-15 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-02-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON, JOSEPHSON |
2017-02-15 | House | PASSED Y31 N4 E5 |
2017-02-15 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2017-02-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON |
2017-02-13 | House | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 2/15 CALENDAR |
2017-02-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 5(AET) |
2017-02-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, BIRCH, MILLETT, CHENAULT, PRUITT |
2017-02-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/13 CALENDAR |
2017-02-10 | House | AET CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-02-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-02-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2017 |
2017-02-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2017-02-10 | House | AM: PARISH |
2017-02-10 | House | NR: TARR |
2017-02-10 | House | DP: BIRCH, TALERICO, DRUMMOND, JOHNSON, RAUSCHER, JOSEPHSON |
2017-02-10 | House | RES RPT CS(AET) 6DP 1NR 1AM |
2017-01-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, SADDLER |
2017-01-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2017-01-27 | House | DP: TUCK, JOSEPHSON, TALERICO, WESTLAKE |
2017-01-27 | House | AET RPT CS(AET) 4DP |
2017-01-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KOPP, TALERICO |
2017-01-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2017-01-20 | House | BILL REPRINTED 1/20/17 |
2017-01-20 | House | AET REFERRAL ADDED BEFORE RES |
2017-01-18 | House | RES |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Energy
Fish & Game (game)
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Oil & Gas
Proclamations
Public Land
Resources
Revenue
Statehood Act
Fish & Game (game)
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Oil & Gas
Proclamations
Public Land
Resources
Revenue
Statehood Act