AK HJR48 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress to pass the Crime Victims Fund Preservation Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime Victims Fund Preservation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-27 PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 69
2010-07-09 3:19 PM 6/10/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2010-07-09 MANIFEST ERROR(S)
2010-04-17 VERSION: HJR 48
2010-04-17 RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2010-04-17 PASSED Y20 N-
2010-04-17 READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 48
2010-04-17 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-17 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-17 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010
2010-04-09 FN1: ZERO(LEG)
2010-04-09 NR: COGHILL
2010-04-09 DP: FRENCH, EGAN, WIELECHOWSKI
2010-04-09 JUD RPT 3DP 1NR
2010-03-26 JUD
2010-03-26 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2010-03-25 VERSION: HJR 48
2010-03-25 TRANSMITTED TO (S)
2010-03-25 COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES, TUCK, PETERSEN, JOHNSON, DAHLSTROM
2010-03-25 PASSED Y32 E5 A3
2010-03-25 READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 48
2010-03-25 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-03-25 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-03-25 RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2010
2010-03-22 COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH
2010-03-22 FN1: ZERO(LEG)
2010-03-22 HAWKER
2010-03-22 DP: GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, KELLY, AUSTERMAN, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE,
2010-03-22 FIN RPT 9DP
2010-02-23 FIN
2010-02-23 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback