AK HJR46 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging Congressional support for the reauthorization of the Denali Commission.
Title
Supporting Denali Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 31 | |
2010-03-19 | 10:02 AM 3/19/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-03-15 | VERSION: HJR 46 | |
2010-03-15 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-03-15 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-03-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 46 | |
2010-03-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2010-03-10 | DP: OLSON, FRENCH, THOMAS, MENARD, KOOKESH | |
2010-03-10 | CRA RPT 5DP | |
2010-02-26 | CRA | |
2010-02-26 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-02-24 | VERSION: HJR 46 | |
2010-02-24 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-02-24 | PASSED Y39 E1 | |
2010-02-24 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 46 | |
2010-02-24 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-02-24 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-02-24 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2010-02-23 | DP: CISSNA, HARRIS, MUNOZ, HERRON | |
2010-02-23 | CRA RPT 4DP | |
2010-02-19 | CRA | |
2010-02-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Budget
Construction
Economic Development
Federal Aid
Funds
Hazardous Waste
Highways
Housing
Intergovernmental Relations
Medical Care
Municipalities
Vocational Training
Budget
Construction
Economic Development
Federal Aid
Funds
Hazardous Waste
Highways
Housing
Intergovernmental Relations
Medical Care
Municipalities
Vocational Training