AK HJR45 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress not to enact Cap and Trade legislation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oppose Federal Cap And Trade Legislation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-27 PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 67
2010-07-09 3:18 PM 6/10/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2010-07-09 MANIFEST ERROR(S)
2010-04-18 VERSION: CSHJR 45(FIN) AM
2010-04-18 RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2010-04-18 PASSED Y19 N1
2010-04-18 MENARD
2010-04-18 CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, DYSON, COGHILL, BUNDE, HUGGINS, MEYER, MCGUIRE,
2010-04-18 READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 45(FIN) AM
2010-04-18 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-18 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-18 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010
2010-04-18 FN2: ZERO(LEG)
2010-04-18 NR: EGAN, OLSON
2010-04-18 DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS
2010-04-18 FIN RPT 4DP 2NR
2010-04-15 RES REFERRAL WAIVED
2010-03-18 RES, FIN
2010-03-18 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2010-03-17 VERSION: CSHJR 45(FIN) AM
2010-03-17 TRANSMITTED TO (S)
2010-03-17 COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
2010-03-17 PASSED Y31 N7 E1 A1
2010-03-17 READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 45(FIN) AM
2010-03-17 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-03-17 AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-03-17 AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N23 E1 A1
2010-03-17 FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-03-17 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-03-17 RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2010
2010-03-15 FN2: ZERO(LEG)
2010-03-15 AM: GARA
2010-03-15 NR: DOOGAN, SALMON
2010-03-15 DP: THOMAS, JOULE, AUSTERMAN, KELLY, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, HAWKER, STOLTZE
2010-03-15 FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 2NR 1AM
2010-03-12 COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH, AUSTERMAN, THOMAS
2010-03-11 COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
2010-02-24 COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON
2010-02-24 FN1: ZERO(H.ENE)
2010-02-24 DP: DAHLSTROM, PETERSEN, JOHANSEN, TUCK, EDGMON, MILLETT
2010-02-24 ENE RPT CS(ENE) 6DP
2010-02-23 COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
2010-02-19 COSPONSOR(S): KELLY
2010-02-17 ENE, FIN
2010-02-17 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback