AK HJR40 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Opposing the proposed designation by the National Marine Fisheries Service of 3,000 square miles of upper Cook Inlet, the mid-inlet, all of the inlet's western shores, and Kachemak Bay as critical habitat for beluga whales.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cook Inlet/kachemak Beluga Population

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-27 PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 42
2010-07-09 3:18 PM 6/10/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2010-07-09 MANIFEST ERROR(S)
2010-04-15 CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N1
2010-04-15 HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
2010-04-15 VERSION: SCS CSHJR 40(RES)
2010-04-15 TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2010-04-15 PASSED Y20 N-
2010-04-15 MENARD
2010-04-15 CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, WAGONER, BUNDE, MCGUIRE, MEYER, STEDMAN, HUGGINS,
2010-04-15 READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 40(RES)
2010-04-15 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-15 RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-15 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-15 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2010
2010-04-10 FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
2010-04-10 NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, FRENCH
2010-04-10 DP: MCGUIRE, WAGONER
2010-04-11 RES SCS RECEIVED SAME TITLE
2010-04-10 RES RPT SCS FORTHCOMING 2DP 3NR
2010-03-02 RES
2010-03-02 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2010-03-01 VERSION: CSHJR 40(RES)
2010-03-01 TRANSMITTED TO (S)
2010-03-01 COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, JOHANSEN
2010-03-01 PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y31 N2 E6 A1
2010-03-01 RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2010-03-01 JOHANSEN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2010-03-01 PASSED Y30 N3 E6 A1
2010-03-01 READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 40(RES)
2010-03-01 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-03-01 BEFORE THE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
2010-03-01 NOT ADVANCED TO THIRD READING SAME DAY
2010-03-01 RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-03-01 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-03-01 RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2010
2010-02-26 COSPONSOR(S): OLSON
2010-02-26 FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
2010-02-26 NR: SEATON, TUCK
2010-02-26 DP: P.WILSON, NEUMAN, JOHNSON
2010-02-26 RES RPT CS(RES) 3DP 2NR
2010-01-29 COSPONSOR(S): GATTO
2010-01-27 RES
2010-01-27 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback