AK HJR38 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE, STEVENS, BEGICH
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to certain conveyances to the Alaska Railroad Corporation under the Alaska Railroad Transfer Act of 1982.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ak Railroad Transfer Act; Conveyances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE, STEVENS, BEGICH
2018-04-24SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2018-04-24SenateTRA
2018-04-24SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-20HouseVERSION: HJR 38
2018-04-20HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, KAWASAKI
2018-04-20HousePASSED Y32 N2 E5 A1
2018-04-20HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HJR 38
2018-04-18HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO, SADDLER
2018-04-18HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/20 CALENDAR
2018-04-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-18HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2018
2018-04-14HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-14HouseNR: LEDOUX
2018-04-14HouseDNP: CLAMAN
2018-04-14HouseDP: EASTMAN, KOPP, STUTES
2018-04-14HouseJUD RPT 3DP 1DNP 1NR
2018-04-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, STUTES, EASTMAN
2018-03-09HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-03-09HouseNR: LEDOUX, WOOL, JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-03-09HouseDP: BIRCH
2018-03-09HouseSTA RPT 1DP 4NR
2018-02-28HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KNOPP, RAUSCHER
2018-02-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, BIRCH, WILSON
2018-02-21HouseSTA, JUD
2018-02-21HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback