AK HJR38 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-09 - COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-09 - COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the Constitution of the State of Alaska relating to and increasing the number of members of the house of representatives to forty-eight and the number of members of the senate to twenty-four.
Title
Const. Am: Increase Number Of Legislators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-09 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN | |
2010-03-31 | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ | |
2010-03-15 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-03-15 | FN2: (LEG) | |
2010-03-15 | FN1: (GOV) | |
2010-03-15 | NR: LYNN, HERRON | |
2010-03-15 | DNP: GATTO | |
2010-03-15 | DP: GRUENBERG, RAMRAS | |
2010-03-15 | JUD RPT CS(STA) NT 2DP 1DNP 2NR | |
2010-02-23 | COSPONSOR(S): SEATON | |
2010-02-19 | FN2: (LEG) | |
2010-02-19 | FN1: (GOV) | |
2010-02-19 | NR: LYNN | |
2010-02-19 | DNP: GATTO | |
2010-02-19 | DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, P.WILSON, PETERSEN | |
2010-02-19 | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 1DNP 1NR | |
2010-02-17 | COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, THOMAS | |
2010-02-15 | COSPONSOR(S): JOULE, SALMON, KERTTULA, AUSTERMAN, EDGMON | |
2010-01-19 | STA, JUD, FIN | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |