AK HJR34 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nat'l Petroleum Reserve In Alaska
Title
Nat'l Petroleum Reserve In Alaska
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 4/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 14 |
2022-04-14 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-04-14 | House | 4:30 P.M. 4/14/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-04-12 | Senate | VERSION: HJR 34 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-04-12 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N- E2 A4 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 34 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/12 CAL |
2022-04-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.RES) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | NR: KIEHL |
2022-04-04 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, BISHOP, STEVENS |
2022-04-04 | Senate | RES RPT 3DP 1NR |
2022-03-23 | Senate | HOLLAND, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, BISHOP, WILSON, MICCICHE |
2022-03-23 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): REVAK, COSTELLO, MYERS, SHOWER, HUGHES, REINBOLD, KAWASAKI |
2022-03-21 | Senate | RES |
2022-03-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-03-18 | House | VERSION: HJR 34 |
2022-03-18 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-03-18 | House | KURKA |
2022-03-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON, MCCARTY, MERRICK, HOPKINS, JOHNSON, STUTES, JOSEPHSON, |
2022-03-18 | House | PASSED Y35 E4 A1 |
2022-03-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 34 |
2022-03-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-03-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-18 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2022 |
2022-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2022-03-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.RES) |
2022-03-14 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, GILLHAM, RAUSCHER, HOPKINS, PATKOTAK |
2022-03-14 | House | RES RPT 5DP |
2022-03-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NELSON, SCHRAGE, VANCE, KAUFMAN |
2022-03-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GILLHAM, MCCABE, MCKAY |
2022-02-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2022-02-22 | House | RES |
2022-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Economic Development
Economy
Environmental Concerns
Funds
Government Organization
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Oil & Gas
Pipelines
Resources
Revenue
Subsistence
Economy
Environmental Concerns
Funds
Government Organization
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Oil & Gas
Pipelines
Resources
Revenue
Subsistence