AK HJR33 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the Alaska delegation in Congress to pursue the establishment of a U.S. Coast Guard port in the Arctic region; supporting the increase in defensive capabilities in the Arctic region; and encouraging the development of critical Arctic infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Develop: Arctic Infrastructure/defense

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-04-23HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-04-20SenateVERSION: CSHJR 33(AET)
2018-04-20SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-20SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-04-20SenateMACKINNON, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, MEYER
2018-04-20SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN, HUGHES, MICCICHE, COSTELLO, SHOWER
2018-04-20SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 33(AET)
2018-04-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-20SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-20SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2018
2018-04-18SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-18SenateDP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, OLSON
2018-04-18SenateARC RPT 3DP
2018-04-06SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, GARDNER, STEVENS, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, KELLY
2018-04-06SenateARC
2018-04-06SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-04HouseVERSION: CSHJR 33(AET)
2018-04-04HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, SPOHNHOLZ, GRENN, DRUMMOND
2018-04-04HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
2018-04-04HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2018-04-04HouseCLAMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-04-04HousePASSED Y39 N1
2018-04-04HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 33(AET)
2018-04-04HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-04HouseAET CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-04HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-04HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 04/04/18
2018-03-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, LINCOLN
2018-03-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP
2018-03-09HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-03-09HouseAM: NEUMAN, TALERICO
2018-03-09HouseDP: EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, TUCK, LINCOLN
2018-03-09HouseAET RPT CS(AET) NT 4DP 2AM
2018-02-09HouseAET
2018-02-09HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback