AK HJR33 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-19 - REFERRED TO RESOURCES
Pending: Senate Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-19 - REFERRED TO RESOURCES
Pending: Senate Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Urging immediate action by the governor, the Alaska Congressional delegation, and state and federal agencies to assist in the restart of oil production in Cook Inlet that was affected by the eruption of Mt. Redoubt, in a safe and responsible manner.
Title
Restart Cook Inlet Production
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-19 | REFERRED TO RESOURCES | |
2009-04-19 | RES | |
2009-04-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-18 | VERSION: CSHJR 33(RES) AM | |
2009-04-18 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-04-18 | COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM | |
2009-04-18 | PASSED Y38 A2 | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 33(RES) AM | |
2009-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-18 | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION | |
2009-04-18 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-18 | RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009 | |
2009-04-17 | FN1: ZERO(H.RES) | |
2009-04-17 | NR: GUTTENBERG, TUCK | |
2009-04-17 | DP: OLSON, EDGMON, SEATON, P.WILSON, NEUMAN, JOHNSON | |
2009-04-17 | RES RPT CS(RES) NT 6DP 2NR | |
2009-04-13 | RES | |
2009-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |