AK HJR30 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-20 - REFERRED TO RLS
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress to reaffirm the commitment of the United States to promote the safety, health, and well-being of refugees and displaced persons; urging the United States government to uphold its international leadership role in responding to displacement crises with humanitarian assistance and to work with the international community and the United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees to find solutions to conflicts and protect refugees; and urging the President of the United States to continue to mitigate the burden placed on frontline refugee host countries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urge U.s. Support Of Refugees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20HouseREFERRED TO RLS
2018-04-20HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-20HouseNR: BIRCH, KNOPP, WOOL, KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-04-20HouseDP: JOSEPHSON
2018-04-20HouseSTA RPT 1DP 4NR
2018-02-28HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-02-28HouseNR: LINCOLN, SADDLER
2018-02-28HouseDNP: TALERICO
2018-02-28HouseDP: KREISS-TOMKINS, DRUMMOND, PARISH
2018-02-28HouseCRA RPT 3DP 1DNP 2NR
2018-01-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
2018-01-24HouseCRA, STA
2018-01-24HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback