AK HJR30 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-15 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 50
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-15 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 50
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the American Psychiatric Association to change the term "post-traumatic stress disorder" or "PTSD" to "post-traumatic stress injury" or "PTSI"; urging the governor to support usage of the term "post-traumatic stress injury"; respectfully requesting that the Alaska delegation in Congress champion this change of designation in the United States Congress; and designating June 27, 2016, as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day.
Title
Post-traumatic Stress Injury
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Herron [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Dan Saddler [R] |
Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 9/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 50 |
2016-07-15 | House | 8:57 AM 7/12/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-03 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2016-04-16 | Senate | VERSION: CSHJR 30(STA) |
2016-04-16 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2016-04-16 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2016-04-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 30(STA) |
2016-04-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(MVA) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | DP: STOLTZE, COGHILL, HUGGINS, MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI |
2016-04-14 | Senate | STA RPT 5DP |
2016-04-11 | Senate | STA |
2016-04-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-09 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 30(STA) |
2016-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI, GARA, SADDLER, LEDOUX |
2016-04-09 | House | PASSED Y35 N1 E4 |
2016-04-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 30(STA) |
2016-04-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-09 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2016 |
2016-04-01 | House | FN2: ZERO(MVA) |
2016-04-01 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-04-01 | House | NR: KELLER |
2016-04-01 | House | DP: SPOHNHOLZ, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2016-04-01 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 1NR |
2016-03-23 | House | FN2: ZERO(MVA) |
2016-03-23 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-03-23 | House | NR: LYNN |
2016-03-23 | House | DP: SPOHNHOLZ, TUCK, LEDOUX, COLVER, HUGHES, HERRON |
2016-03-23 | House | MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 6DP 1NR |
2016-02-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2016-02-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2016-02-19 | House | MLV, STA |
2016-02-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |