AK HJR3 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-02 - COSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-02 - COSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the Constitution of the State of Alaska relating to the duration of regular sessions of the legislature.
Title
Const. Am: 90 Day Regular Session
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Claman [D] | Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] | Rep. Adam Wool [D] | Rep. Jason Grenn [I] |
Rep. Colleen Sullivan-Leonard [R] | Sen. Lora Reinbold [R] | Rep. Daniel Ortiz [I] | Rep. David Eastman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN |
2017-05-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2017-05-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2017-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2017-01-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRENN |
2017-01-18 | House | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2017-01-18 | House | STA, JUD, FIN |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HJR3 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HJR003A.PDF |