AK HJR29 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress to reauthorize the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reauthorize Secure Rural Schools Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-04-20HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-04-18SenateVERSION: CSHJR 29(FIN)
2018-04-18SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-18SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, SHOWER, BISHOP, STEDMAN
2018-04-18SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-04-18SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 29(FIN)
2018-04-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-18SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-18SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2018
2018-04-17SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-17SenateAM: STEDMAN
2018-04-17SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER
2018-04-17SenateDP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, COGHILL
2018-04-17SenateRES RPT 3DP 2NR 1AM
2018-04-12SenateRES
2018-04-12SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-11HouseVERSION: CSHJR 29(FIN)
2018-04-11HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-11HouseCOSPONSOR(S): BIRCH, STUTES, MILLETT
2018-04-11HousePASSED Y40
2018-04-11HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 29(FIN)
2018-04-11HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-11HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-11HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-11HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2018
2018-03-30HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH
2018-03-29HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TILTON
2018-03-29HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-03-29HouseFOSTER
2018-03-29HouseDP: GARA, WILSON, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, TILTON, SEATON,
2018-03-29HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 9DP
2018-03-28HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WILSON, GARA
2018-03-12HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-03-12HouseDP: KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, LEDOUX, CLAMAN
2018-03-12HouseJUD RPT CS(STA) 4DP
2018-02-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP
2018-02-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2018-02-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-02-02HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-02-02HouseDP: TUCK, BIRCH, JOHNSON, WOOL, LEDOUX, KNOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-02-02HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) 7DP
2018-01-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
2018-01-19HouseSTA, JUD, FIN
2018-01-19HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback