AK HJR29 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to reauthorize the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000.
Title
Reauthorize Secure Rural Schools Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-04-20 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-04-18 | Senate | VERSION: CSHJR 29(FIN) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-18 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, SHOWER, BISHOP, STEDMAN |
2018-04-18 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-04-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 29(FIN) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | AM: STEDMAN |
2018-04-17 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER |
2018-04-17 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, COGHILL |
2018-04-17 | Senate | RES RPT 3DP 2NR 1AM |
2018-04-12 | Senate | RES |
2018-04-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-11 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 29(FIN) |
2018-04-11 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): BIRCH, STUTES, MILLETT |
2018-04-11 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2018-04-11 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 29(FIN) |
2018-04-11 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-11 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-11 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2018 |
2018-03-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PARISH |
2018-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON |
2018-03-29 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-03-29 | House | FOSTER |
2018-03-29 | House | DP: GARA, WILSON, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, TILTON, SEATON, |
2018-03-29 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 9DP |
2018-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, GARA |
2018-03-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-03-12 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, LEDOUX, CLAMAN |
2018-03-12 | House | JUD RPT CS(STA) 4DP |
2018-02-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2018-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2018-02-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2018-02-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-02-02 | House | DP: TUCK, BIRCH, JOHNSON, WOOL, LEDOUX, KNOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2018-02-02 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 7DP |
2018-01-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN |
2018-01-19 | House | STA, JUD, FIN |
2018-01-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Agriculture
Education
Federal Aid
Forestry
Highways
Intergovernmental Relations
Revenue
Revenue Sharing
Schools
Education
Federal Aid
Forestry
Highways
Intergovernmental Relations
Revenue
Revenue Sharing
Schools