AK HJR26 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress to adequately fund land surveys in Alaska in order to issue patents to the State of Alaska and Alaska Native corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statehood/ancsa Land Survey Funding

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-27 PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 66
2010-07-09 3:18 PM 6/10/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2010-04-18 CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 A1
2010-04-14 HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
2010-04-14 VERSION: SCS HJR 26(RES)
2010-04-14 TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2010-04-14 PASSED Y20 N-
2010-04-14 PASKVAN, MENARD, EGAN, MEYER, MCGUIRE, STEDMAN, OLSON
2010-04-14 CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, WAGONER, THOMAS, DYSON, DAVIS, KOOKESH, COGHILL,
2010-04-14 READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HJR 26(RES)
2010-04-14 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-14 RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-14 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-14 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2010
2010-04-10 FN2: ZERO(H.RLS)
2010-04-10 NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, FRENCH
2010-04-10 DP: MCGUIRE, WAGONER
2010-04-13 CORRECTED RES RPT RECEIVED W/SCS SAME TITLE
2010-04-10 RES RPT 2DP 3NR
2010-02-17 RES
2010-02-17 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2010-02-15 VERSION: HJR 26
2010-02-15 TRANSMITTED TO (S)
2010-02-15 COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, JOHANSEN
2010-02-15 PASSED Y36 E3 A1
2010-02-15 READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 26
2010-02-15 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-02-15 FN2: ZERO(H.RLS)
2010-02-15 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-02-15 RULES TO CALENDAR 2/15/2010
2009-04-07 FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
2009-04-07 NR: OLSON, SEATON, TUCK
2009-04-07 DP: P.WILSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN
2009-04-07 RES RPT 3DP 3NR
2009-03-25 COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
2009-03-18 RES
2009-03-18 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback