AK HJR23 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - BILL REPRINTED 3/12/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the Constitution of the State of Alaska relating to the Alaska permanent fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Const Am: Permanent Fund; Pomv; Dividend;

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House: House Finance Committee become the prime sponsor (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: House Finance Committee become the prime sponsor (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseBILL REPRINTED 3/12/18
2018-03-12HouseRESCIND ACTION PRIME SPON FAILED Y19 N20 E1
2018-03-12HousePRIME SPONSOR: FINANCE Y20 N18 E1 A1
2018-03-07HouseCOSPONSOR REMOVED: GARA
2017-10-23HouseCOSPONSOR REMOVED: GRENN
2017-05-05HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2017-05-05HouseFIN
2017-05-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback