AK HJR22 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Senate to ratify the United Nations Convention on the Law of the Sea (the Law of the Sea Treaty).
Title
Urging Us To Ratify Law Of The Sea Treaty
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Dahlstrom [R] | Rep. Max Gruenberg [D] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Rep. Paul Seaton [R] |
Rep. Peggy Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | PERMANENTLY FILED 7/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 14 | |
2009-08-05 | 4:45 PM 5/27/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-04-16 | VERSION: HJR 22 | |
2009-04-16 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2009-04-16 | PASSED Y15 N2 A2 V1 | |
2009-04-16 | THOMAS | |
2009-04-16 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, ELLIS, PASKVAN, MCGUIRE, MEYER, HOFFMAN, FRENCH, | |
2009-04-16 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 22 | |
2009-04-16 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-16 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-16 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | FN1: ZERO(H.STA) | |
2009-04-14 | NR: WAGONER, HUGGINS | |
2009-04-14 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, FRENCH | |
2009-04-14 | RES RPT 3DP 2NR | |
2009-04-09 | RES | |
2009-04-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-08 | VERSION: HJR 22 | |
2009-04-08 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-04-08 | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, DAHLSTROM, P.WILSON | |
2009-04-08 | PASSED Y34 N4 E1 A1 | |
2009-04-08 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 22 | |
2009-04-08 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-08 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-08 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-19 | FN1: ZERO(H.STA) | |
2009-03-19 | NR: JOHNSON | |
2009-03-19 | DP: GATTO, SEATON, GRUENBERG, P.WILSON, PETERSEN, LYNN | |
2009-03-19 | STA RPT 6DP 1NR | |
2009-03-02 | STA | |
2009-03-02 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |