AK HJR19 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting Investment In Infrastructure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting Investment In Infrastructure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 3 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-05-19SenateL&C REFERRAL - DISCHARGED FROM COMMITTEE UC
2021-05-17SenateTRA REFERRAL REMOVED
2021-05-14SenateTRA, L&C
2021-05-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-12HouseVERSION: CSHJR 19(L&C) AM
2021-05-12HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2021-05-12HousePASSED Y30 N9 A1
2021-05-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 19(L&C) AM
2021-05-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-12HouseAM NO 8 FAILED Y19 N21
2021-05-12HouseAM NO 7 ADOPTED UC
2021-05-12HouseAM NO 6 ADOPTED UC
2021-05-12HouseAM NO 5 FAILED Y12 N28
2021-05-12HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y16 N23 A1
2021-05-12HouseAM NO 3 AS AM FAILED Y15 N21 A4
2021-05-12HouseAM 1 TO AM 3 ADOPTED Y25 N11 A4
2021-05-12HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
2021-05-12HouseAM NO 3 OFFERED AND PENDING
2021-05-12HouseAM NO 2 ADOPTED Y39 A1
2021-05-12HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y39 A1
2021-05-12HouseL&C CS ADOPTED UC
2021-05-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2021
2021-05-06HouseFN1: ZERO(H.L&C)
2021-05-06HouseDP: SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SNYDER, NELSON, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
2021-05-06HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) 6DP
2021-04-28HouseL&C
2021-04-28HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback