AK HJR19 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Support 2020 Decennial Census

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Support 2020 Decennial Census

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30HouseLEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 5
2019-08-30House11:52 AM 8/30/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-12SenateVERSION: CSHJR 19(TRB)
2019-05-12SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2019-05-12SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2019-05-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 19(TRB)
2019-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-12SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2019
2019-05-11SenateFN1: ZERO(H.TRB)
2019-05-11SenateDP: BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, BIRCH, COSTELLO
2019-05-11SenateCRA RPT 5DP
2019-05-10SenateCRA
2019-05-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-05-09HouseVERSION: CSHJR 19(TRB)
2019-05-09HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2019-05-09HousePASSED Y29 N4 E1 A6
2019-05-09HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 19(TRB)
2019-05-09HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-09HouseTRB CS ADOPTED UC
2019-05-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-09HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2019
2019-05-07HouseFN1: ZERO(H.TRB)
2019-05-07HouseNR: JACKSON, REVAK
2019-05-07HouseDP: CLAMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS, THOMPSON, DRUMMOND, HANNAN
2019-05-07HouseCRA RPT CS(TRB) 5DP 2NR
2019-04-26HouseFN1: ZERO(H.TRB)
2019-04-26HouseDP: VANCE, ORTIZ, LINCOLN, KOPP, TALERICO, ZULKOSKY
2019-04-26HouseTRB RPT CS(TRB) 6DP
2019-04-24HouseTRB, CRA
2019-04-24HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback