AK HJR19 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commending the Arctic Waterways Safety Committee; supporting the adoption of prevention measures into international agreements to ensure clear, universal, and enforceable marine safety measures in the Arctic; urging the state's delegation in the United States Congress and the governor to promote the adoption of spill prevention measures into international agreements; and urging the President of the United States and the United States Department of State to initiate negotiations to enter into international agreements to ensure safe and environmentally responsible marine operations in the Arctic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arctic Marine Safety Agreements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-04-20HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-04-18SenateVERSION: CSHJR 19(AET)
2018-04-18SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-18SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, MEYER, MICCICHE, VON IMHOF, BISHOP
2018-04-18SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-04-18SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 19(AET)
2018-04-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-18SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-18SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2018
2018-04-06SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
2018-03-21SenateFN2: ZERO(S.ARC)
2018-03-21SenateDP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, KELLY
2018-03-21SenateARC RPT 4DP
2018-02-14HouseRETURNED TO SENATE
2018-02-14HouseBILL REPRINTED ALL VERSIONS 2/14/18
2018-02-14HousePRIME SPONSOR: LINCOLN
2018-02-14HouseBILL RECEIVED IN HOUSE
2018-02-14SenateRETURNED TO HOUSE PER REQUEST
2017-05-17SenateARC
2017-05-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-05-16HouseVERSION: CSHJR 19(AET)
2017-05-16HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO
2017-05-16HousePASSED Y33 N6 E1
2017-05-16HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 19(AET)
2017-05-15HouseNOT TAKEN UP 5/15 - ON 5/16 CALENDAR
2017-05-13HouseHELD TO 5/15 CALENDAR
2017-05-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2017-05-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/13 CALENDAR
2017-05-12HouseAET CS ADOPTED UC
2017-05-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2017
2017-04-26HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-04-26HouseDP: TALERICO, JOSEPHSON, TUCK, NEUMAN, KNOPP, WESTLAKE
2017-04-26HouseTECHNICAL TITLE CORRECTION
2017-04-26HouseAET RPT CS(AET) NT 6DP
2017-04-07HouseAET
2017-04-07HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback