AK HJR18 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the Constitution of the State of Alaska relating to the office of attorney general.
Title
Const. Am: Elected Attorney General
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Stoltze [R] | Rep. Wes Keller [R] | Rep. Lynn Gattis [R] | Sen. Lora Reinbold [R] |
Rep. Bob Herron [D] | Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-03-27 | House | FN2: (GOV) |
2014-03-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-03-27 | House | NR: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, MUNOZ, EDGMON, GARA, COSTELLO |
2014-03-27 | House | DP: NEUMAN, THOMPSON, T.WILSON, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN |
2014-03-27 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 6NR |
2014-03-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON |
2014-03-18 | House | FN2: (GOV) |
2014-03-18 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-03-18 | House | NR: MILLETT, PRUITT |
2014-03-18 | House | DNP: GRUENBERG |
2014-03-18 | House | DP: KELLER |
2014-03-18 | House | JUD RPT 1DP 1DNP 2NR |
2014-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HERRON |
2014-02-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2014-02-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KELLER, GATTIS |
2014-02-12 | House | FN2: (GOV) |
2014-02-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-02-12 | House | AM: ISAACSON, HUGHES |
2014-02-12 | House | NR: KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN |
2014-02-12 | House | DP: GATTIS, KELLER |
2014-02-12 | House | STA RPT 2DP 2NR 2AM |
2014-01-21 | House | STA, JUD, FIN |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14 |