AK HJR15 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Encouraging repeal of the REAL ID Act of 2005.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oppose Federal Id Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2017-04-17SenateSTA
2017-04-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-16HouseVERSION: CSHJR 15(STA)
2017-04-16HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN, PARISH, MILLETT, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2017-04-16HousePASSED Y38 N1 E1
2017-04-16HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 15(STA)
2017-04-16HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-16HouseSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-16HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-16HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2017
2017-04-03HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-04-03HouseDP: JOHNSON, WOOL, LEDOUX, KNOPP, BIRCH, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-04-03HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) 7DP
2017-03-29HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK
2017-03-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
2017-03-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TILTON
2017-03-10HouseSTA
2017-03-10HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback