AK HJR14 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging Support For Nome Deep Draft Port

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Support For Nome Deep Draft Port

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2019-05-11SenateVERSION: HJR 14
2019-05-11SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2019-05-11SenatePASSED Y19 N- A1
2019-05-11SenateGRAY-JACKSON, HUGHES, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, STEDMAN, BISHOP, GIESSEL
2019-05-11SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, OLSON, SHOWER, KAWASAKI, BIRCH, STEVENS
2019-05-11SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HJR 14
2019-05-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-11SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-11SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2019
2019-05-08SenateFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2019-05-08SenateDP: BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, COSTELLO, BIRCH
2019-05-08SenateCRA RPT 5DP
2019-04-30SenateCRA
2019-04-30SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-04-29HouseVERSION: HJR 14
2019-04-29HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2019-04-29HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR, KOPP, SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, HANNAN
2019-04-29HousePASSED Y39 N1
2019-04-29HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HJR 14
2019-04-29HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-04-29HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-29HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2019
2019-04-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK, VANCE
2019-04-24HouseFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2019-04-24HouseNR: RASMUSSEN
2019-04-24HouseDP: DRUMMOND, CLAMAN, STORY, TALERICO, WOOL, STUTES
2019-04-24HouseTRA RPT 6DP 1NR
2019-03-25HouseTRA
2019-03-25HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback