AK HJR14 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-15 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Making application to the United States Congress to call a convention of the states to propose a countermand amendment to the Constitution of the United States as provided under art. V, Constitution of the United States; and urging the legislatures of the other 49 states to make the same application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Call For Us Countermand Convention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-16 - House - House: Concur (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate: SCS CSHJR 14(STA) Second Reading Amendment No. 1? (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-15HousePERMANENTLY FILED 9/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 49
2016-07-11House11:39 AM 7/6/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2016-06-03HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2016-04-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): COLVER
2016-04-16HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y28 N10 E1 A1
2016-04-16HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2016-04-16SenateVERSION: SCS CSHJR 14(STA)
2016-04-16SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2016-04-16SenatePASSED Y13 N5 E1 A1
2016-04-16SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 14(STA)
2016-04-15SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, DUNLEAVY, KELLY, MCGUIRE, COGHILL, BISHOP
2016-04-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/16 CALENDAR
2016-04-15SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y4 N16
2016-04-15SenateSTA SCS ADOPTED UC
2016-04-15SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-04-15SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2016
2016-04-13SenateFN2: ZERO(LEG)(UPDATED FROM RULES)
2016-04-13SenateDP: STOLTZE, COGHILL, HUGGINS
2016-04-13SenateSTA RPT SCS 3DP SAME TITLE
2016-04-11SenateSTA
2016-04-11SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2016-04-10HouseVERSION: CSHJR 14(STA)
2016-04-10HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2016-04-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, WILSON
2016-04-10HousePASSED Y24 N15 E1
2016-04-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 14(STA)
2016-04-10HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2016-04-10HouseSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2016-04-10HouseFN2: ZERO(LEG)(UPDATED FROM RULES)
2016-04-10HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-04-10HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2015
2016-04-06HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TILTON
2015-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KELLER
2015-04-09HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2015-04-09HouseAM: CLAMAN
2015-04-09HouseDNP: GRUENBERG
2015-04-09HouseDP: MILLETT, LYNN, KELLER, LEDOUX
2015-04-09HouseJUD RPT CS(STA) 4DP 1DNP 1AM
2015-03-25HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2015-03-25HouseNR: TALERICO, STUTES, GRUENBERG, KREISS-TOMKINS
2015-03-25HouseDP: VAZQUEZ, LYNN, KELLER
2015-03-25HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) 3DP 4NR
2015-03-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LYNN
2015-02-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2015-02-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, STUTES
2015-02-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
2015-02-11HouseSTA, JUD
2015-02-11HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback