AK HJR12 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Opposing the United States Food and Drug Administration's approval of AquaBounty AquAdvantage genetically engineered salmon; and urging the United States Congress to enact legislation that requires prominently labeling genetically engineered salmon and salmon products with the words "Genetically Modified" on the product's packaging.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opposing Gen. Engineered Salmon

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-23HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-02-23HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-02-19SenateVERSION: CSHJR 12(FSH)
2018-02-19SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-02-19SenatePASSED Y19 N- V1
2018-02-19SenateMEYER, STEVENS, MICCICHE, GIESSEL, STEDMAN
2018-02-19SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, BISHOP, MACKINNON, GARDNER, EGAN, OLSON, BEGICH
2018-02-19SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 12(FSH)
2018-02-19SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-02-19SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-19SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/2018
2018-01-31SenateFN2: ZERO(S.RES)
2018-01-31SenateNR: COGHILL, VON IMHOF, STEDMAN, MEYER
2018-01-31SenateDP: GIESSEL, WIELECHOWSKI
2018-01-31SenateRES RPT 2DP 4NR
2017-04-06SenateRES
2017-04-06SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-05HouseVERSION: CSHJR 12(FSH)
2017-04-05HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH, STUTES, GRENN, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-04-05HousePASSED Y40
2017-04-05HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 12(FSH)
2017-04-05HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-05HouseFSH CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-05HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-05HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2017
2017-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-03-24HouseDP: PARISH, WESTLAKE, DRUMMOND, TARR, JOSEPHSON
2017-03-24HouseRES RPT CS(FSH) NT 5DP
2017-03-01HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-03-01HouseNR: EASTMAN
2017-03-01HouseDP: FANSLER, TARR, CHENAULT, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES
2017-03-01HouseFSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 5DP 1NR
2017-02-22HouseFSH, RES
2017-02-22HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback