AK HJR1 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-02 - COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Const Am: Permanent Fund; Pomv;earnings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Const Am: Permanent Fund; Pomv;earnings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
2021-05-01HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2021-05-01HouseFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2021-05-01HouseAM: VANCE
2021-05-01HouseNR: KURKA
2021-05-01HouseDNP: EASTMAN
2021-05-01HouseDP: DRUMMOND, SNYDER, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN
2021-05-01HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM
2021-04-22HouseFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2021-04-22HouseDNP: EASTMAN, PRAX
2021-04-22HouseDP: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, SCHRAGE, STORY, SPOHNHOLZ
2021-04-22HouseW&M RPT CS(W&M) 5DP 2DNP
2021-04-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
2021-03-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2021-03-10HouseW&M REPLACES STA REFERRAL
2021-02-18HouseSTA, JUD, FIN
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-02-18HouseSPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME
2021-02-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback