AK HCR7 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the governor to join the legislature in opposing the selection of the G South Alternative for the Sterling Highway Milepost 45-60 Project and supporting the selection of the Juneau Creek Alternative; urging the governor to request that the United States Secretary of the Interior initiate a land exchange under the Russian River Land Act; and urging the governor to request that the commissioner of transportation and public facilities and the Division Administrator of the Federal Highway Administration reevaluate the selection of the G South Alternative.
Title
Cooper Landing Bypass
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Chenault [R] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Sen. Chris Birch [R] |
Rep. Lance Pruitt [R] | Sen. Peter Micciche [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE |
2017-03-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-03-31 | Senate | TRA |
2017-03-31 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-29 | House | VERSION: HCR 7 |
2017-03-29 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, BIRCH, PRUITT |
2017-03-29 | House | PASSED Y36 N4 |
2017-03-29 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-29 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2017-03-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.TRA) |
2017-03-10 | House | NR: CLAMAN |
2017-03-10 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KOPP, NEUMAN, DRUMMOND, WOOL, STUTES |
2017-03-10 | House | TRA RPT 6DP 1NR |
2017-02-27 | House | TRA |
2017-02-27 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |