AK HCR5 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, BUNDE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, BUNDE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the governor to provide energy security for all Alaskans by working on significant elements and components to support the timely construction of a natural gas bullet pipeline from the North Slope to the Cook Inlet region and to take necessary and appropriate action to assist and facilitate the process for a private entity to make a final investment decision to commit to the pipeline before November 1, 2010.
Title
In-state Gas Pipeline
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Chenault [R] | Rep. Nancy Dahlstrom [R] | Rep. Michael Hawker [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] |
Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. Jay Ramras [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, BUNDE | |
2009-03-02 | REFERRED TO RESOURCES | |
2009-03-02 | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEDMAN | |
2009-03-02 | DP: MCGUIRE | |
2009-03-02 | ENE RPT 1DP 2NR | |
2009-02-19 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES | |
2009-02-11 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, MCGUIRE, MEYER, HUGGINS, STEVENS | |
2009-02-11 | ENE, RES | |
2009-02-11 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-02-09 | VERSION: HCR 5 AM | |
2009-02-09 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-02-09 | PASSED Y29 N4 E5 A2 | |
2009-02-09 | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION | |
2009-02-09 | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-02-09 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y29 N4 E5 A2 | |
2009-02-09 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-02-09 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/9/2009 | |
2009-02-06 | AM: KAWASAKI | |
2009-02-06 | NR: P.WILSON | |
2009-02-06 | DP: OLSON, TUCK, JOHNSON, NEUMAN | |
2009-02-06 | RES RPT 4DP 1NR 1AM | |
2009-02-04 | COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM | |
2009-02-04 | NR: JOHANSEN | |
2009-02-04 | DP: TUCK, PETERSEN, DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS, MILLETT, EDGMON | |
2009-02-04 | ENE RPT 6DP 1NR | |
2009-01-22 | COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER | |
2009-01-21 | ENE, RES | |
2009-01-21 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |