AK HCR401 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 54, relating to crime and criminal law; relating to violation of condition of release; relating to sex trafficking; relating to sentencing; relating to imprisonment; relating to parole; relating to probation; relating to driving without a license; and relating to the pretrial services program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 54

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-11-10 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-11-06 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29HousePERMANENTLY FILED 11/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 17
2017-11-29House10:37 AM 11/21/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-11-10SenateVERSION: HCR 401
2017-11-10SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2017-11-10SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2017-11-10SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2017-11-10SenateTAKEN UP UC
2017-11-09SenateHELD ON SECRETARY'S DESK
2017-11-08SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME
2017-11-06HouseVERSION: HCR 401
2017-11-06HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-11-06HousePASSED Y40
2017-11-06HouseSPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS
2017-11-03HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback