AK HCR29 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 305, providing that the tax rate applicable to the production of oil as the average production tax value of oil, gas produced in the Cook Inlet sedimentary basin, and gas produced outside of the Cook Inlet sedimentary basin and used in the state increases above $30 shall be 0.4 percent multiplied by the number that represents the difference between that average monthly production tax value and $30, or the sum of 25 percent and the product of 0.1 percent multiplied by the number that represents the difference between that average monthly production tax value and $92.50, except that the total rate determined in the calculation may not exceed 50 percent; providing for an increase in the rate of tax on the production of gas as the average production tax value on a BTU equivalent barrel basis of gas produced outside of the Cook Inlet sedimentary basin and not used in the state increases above $30; relating to payments of the oil and gas production tax; relating to availability of a portion of the money received from the tax on oil and gas production for appropriation to the community revenue sharing fund; and relating to the allocation of lease expenditures and adjustments to lease expenditures.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 305
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 59 | |
2010-07-09 | 11:27 AM 6/11/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: HCR 29 | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-18 | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: HCR 29 | |
2010-04-18 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y39 N1 | |
2010-04-18 | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS | |
2010-04-17 | HELD TO 4/18 CALENDAR | |
2010-04-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | RLS FOR CALENDARING | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |